US HB2750 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of a dispute related to the employment or reemployment rights of a uniformed service member.
Title
Justice for Servicemembers Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1491 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2459 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2459 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Labor-management relations
Law
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Labor-management relations
Law
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2750/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2750/BILLS-116hr2750ih.pdf |