US HB2749 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill applies certain small business subcontracting limitations to a small business concern owned and controlled by a veteran or a veteran with a service-connected disability. The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) may award a contract only after obtaining a certification from the offeror that it will comply with such subcontracting limitations if awarded the contract. Such certification shall: (1) specify the applicable performance requirements, and (2) explicitly acknowledge that the certification is subject to criminal penalties for making false statements in any matter within the jurisdiction of the U.S. government. The VA Director of Small and Disadvantaged Business Utilization and the VA Chief Acquisition Officer shall jointly refer any violation or suspected violation to the VA Inspector General. If the VA determines that a contract recipient did not act in good faith, such recipient shall be subject to any or all of the following: (1) referral to the VA Debarment and Suspension Committee, (2) a criminal fine, and (3) criminal prosecution. The Inspector General shall submit an annual report to Congress for each of 2018-2022 that includes: (1) the number of referred and suspected violations; and (2) the disposition of such violations, including the number of small business concerns suspended or debarred from federal contracting or referred for Department of Justice prosecution.
Title
Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6175) |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6199) |
2017-07-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2749. |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6175-6176) |
2017-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 175. |
2017-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-243. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and paralysis
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and paralysis
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation