US HB2748 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The bill requires the development of strategies to help fish, wildlife, and plants adapt to extreme weather changes and climate change. Specifically, the bill requires the President to establish an interagency National Fish, Wildlife, and Plants Climate Adaptation Strategy Joint Implementation Working Group. The working group must adopt the 2013 National Fish, Wildlife, and Plants Climate Adaptation Strategy, which addresses the effects of extreme weather and climate change on fish, wildlife, and plants. After the Committee on Earth and Environmental Sciences releases a periodic scientific assessment required under the U.S. Global Change Research Program, the working group must use sound science to review and revise the strategy to incorporate new information and advances in the development of strategies to help fish, wildlife, and plants adapt. Each federal agency must integrate the strategy into agency plans, environmental reviews, and programs. The Department of the Interior must establish a National Climate Change and Wildlife Science Center to assess and develop scientific information, tools, strategies, and techniques to support the working group and other interested parties in addressing the effects of extreme weather and climate change. Interior must establish an Advisory Committee on Climate Change and Natural Resource Sciences to advise the working group.
Title
SAFE Act Safeguarding America's Future and Environment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 385. |
2020-09-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-481. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2020-01-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 15. |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1482 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Indian lands and resources rights
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Scientific communication
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Air quality
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Fishes
Indian lands and resources rights
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Scientific communication
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection