US HB2742 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to require that military working dogs be retired in the United States, and for other purposes. This bill requires that a military working dog be retired in the United States, except when a U.S. citizen living abroad adopts the dog at the time of retirement. Amounts available to the military department concerned shall be available for such dog's transport to the United States for retirement.
Title
To amend title 10, United States Code, to require that military working dogs be retired in the United States, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Graham [D-FL] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4246) |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2015-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1498 (Same As) 2015-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3681; text of measure as introduced: CR S3681)
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Armed forces and national security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Mammals
Service animals
Armed forces and national security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Mammals
Service animals
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2742/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2742/BILLS-114hr2742ih.pdf |