US HB2739 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-20)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act This bill prohibits the awarding of a contract to an entity for the procurement of rolling stock for use in public transportation if the manufacturer of the rolling stock is (1) incorporated or has manufacturing facilities in the United States; and (2) is owned or controlled by an entity based in a country that is identified as a nonmarket economy country, was identified by the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative (USTR) as a priority foreign country (e.g., a country that does not protect intellectual property rights), and is subject to monitoring by the USTR. This includes the People's Republic of China. Any recipient of financial assistance for public transportation that operates a rail fixed guideway service must certify that is will not award any contract for the procurement of rail rolling stock for use in public transportation to a manufacturer of rolling stock that is described by this bill. A recipient that operates a rail fixed guideway public transportation system must certify that it has a written plan for identifying and reducing cybersecurity risks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB846 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1663 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback