US HB273 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Housing Preservation Act of 2011 - Amends the Housing Act of 1949 to revise the requirements for consideration as rural areas with respect to assistance for farm housing. States that any area classified as "rural" or a "rural area" before October 1, 1990, and determined not to be "rural" or a "rural area" as a result of data received from or after the 1990, 2000, or 2010 (currently, only the 1990 or 2000) decennial census shall continue to be so classified until the receipt of data from the decennial census in the year 2020 (currently, 2010), if, as under current law, such area has a population of between 10,000 and 25,000, is rural in character, and has a serious lack of mortgage credit for lower and moderate-income families.
Title
Rural Housing Preservation Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Timothy Johnson [R-IL] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity. |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB878 (Same As) 2011-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6416 (Related) 2012-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
HB6416 (Related) 2012-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Rural conditions and development
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/273/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr273/BILLS-112hr273ih.pdf |