US HB2726 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a plan to reduce the backlog of requests for information made to the Department of Veterans Affairs pursuant to section 552 of title 5, United States Code, and for other purposes.
Title
VA FOIA Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2778-2779) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2726. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2778-2779) |
2021-06-15 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2163 (Same As) 2021-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.