US HB2718 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 110-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To impose additional sanctions with respect to Iran and modify other existing sanctions with respect to Iran, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maximum Pressure Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]
Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS]Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI]Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA]
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1699 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB488 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Afghanistan
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business ethics
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Iraq
Israel
Latin America
Lebanon
Legislative rules and procedure
Licensing and registrations
Marine and inland water transportation
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Militias and paramilitary groups
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Palestinians
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Sanctions
Saudi Arabia
Securities
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
United Arab Emirates
Venezuela
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback