US HB2712 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure that certain loan programs of the Small Business Administration are made available to cannabis-related legitimate businesses and service providers, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring Safe Capital Access for All Small Businesses Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3617 (Related) 2022-04-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4591 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4591 (Related) 2022-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2712/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2712/BILLS-117hr2712ih.pdf |