US HB2711 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Methane Waste Prevention Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Methane Waste Prevention Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-24HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback