US HB2704 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Based Independence for Seniors Act of 2015 This bill amends part C (Medicare+Choice) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a Community-Based Institutional Special Needs Plan demonstration program to provide home and community-based care to eligible Medicare beneficiaries age 65 or older.
Title
Community Based Independence for Seniors Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-06-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB704 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182.
HB4212 (Related) 2015-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4212 (Related) 2015-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Adult day care
Aging
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Nursing
Aging
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Nursing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2704/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2704/BILLS-114hr2704ih.pdf |