US HB2700 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lowering Prescription Drug Costs and Extending Community Health Centers and Other Public Health Priorities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lowering Prescription Drug Costs and Extending Community Health Centers and Other Public Health Priorities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB938 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24.
HB965 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1499 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
HB1943 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2668 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2680 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB340 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
HB3053 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Consumer affairs
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Education programs funding
Family planning and birth control
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Medical education
Medical research
Minority health
National and community service
Prescription drugs
Product development and innovation
Sex and reproductive health
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback