US HB2699 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Nuclear Waste Policy Act of 1982, and for other purposes.
Title
Nuclear Waste Policy Amendments Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Armed Services, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-14 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change Prior to Referral. |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2917 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Education programs funding
Energy
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Missouri
Nevada
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Public contracts and procurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Education programs funding
Energy
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government trust funds
Great Lakes
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Missouri
Nevada
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Public contracts and procurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2699/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2699/BILLS-116hr2699ih.pdf |