US HB2695 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To rename the Success Dam in Tulare County, California, as the Richard L. Schafer Dam. This bill designates the Success Dam in Tulare County, California, as the "Richard L. Schafer Dam."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To rename the Success Dam in Tulare County, California, as the Richard L. Schafer Dam.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4378)
2019-06-10HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4378)
2019-06-10HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
2019-06-10HouseMs. Mucarsel-Powell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback