US HB2689 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-23 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Minority Business Development Agency of the Department of Commerce to promote and administer programs in the public and private sectors to assist the development of minority business enterprises, to ensure that such Agency has the necessary supporting resources, particularly during economic downturns, and for other purposes.
Title
Minority Business Resiliency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23. |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1255 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1749 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2068 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228.
SB1749 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2068 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2689/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2689/BILLS-117hr2689ih.pdf |