US HB2688 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing Accountability and Transparency to Incentivize Economically Necessary Transitions in Health Care Act of 2013 or the PATIENT's Health Care Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to health savings accounts (HSAs), to: allow a new tax deduction for premiums paid for a high deductible health care plan; repeal the requirement that an individual making a tax deductible contribution to an HSA be covered by a high deductible health care plan; increase the maximum HSA contribution level; allow Medicare beneficiaries to contribute to an HSA; allow a rollover of HSA amounts to a Medicare Advantage Medical Savings Account (MSA); allow a transfer of a flexible spending arrangement balance to an HSA upon separation from employment; allow payments of high deductible health plan premiums from HSAs; repeal the prohibition against payment of over-the-counter drugs from HSAs, Archer MSAs, and health flexible spending and reimbursement arrangements; allow payment of long-term care premiums from health flexible spending arrangements; allow a rollover of Archer MSA and HSA amounts to adult children of an account holder; allow a carryover of up to $500 of unused health benefits in cafeteria plans and flexible spending arrangements; allow Medicare beneficiaries to contribute to a Medicare Advantage MSA; and establish child health savings accounts and allow tax deductible contributions to such accounts. Amends the Public Health Service Act to permit the operation of individual and group health insurance plans across state lines. Sets forth requirements and limitations applicable to issuers of such plans in the primary and secondary states governing such issuers. Extends through December 31, 2016, the Preexisting Condition Insurance Plan (PCIP program) established by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
PATIENT's Health Care Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2835 (Related) 2013-07-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB762 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3165 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2900 (Related) 2013-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB4180 (Related) 2014-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB762 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3165 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2900 (Related) 2013-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB4180 (Related) 2014-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment and training programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
State and local government operations
Tax treatment of families
Child health
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment and training programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
State and local government operations
Tax treatment of families
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2688/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2688/BILLS-113hr2688ih.pdf |