US HB2685 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the National Telecommunications and Information Administration to examine and report on the cybersecurity of mobile service networks and the vulnerability of these networks and mobile devices to cyberattacks and surveillance conducted by adversaries. The report shall include (1) an assessment of the degree to which providers of mobile service have addressed certain cybersecurity vulnerabilities; (2) a discussion of the degree to which these providers have implemented cybersecurity best practices and risk assessment frameworks; and (3) an estimate of the prevalence and efficacy of encryption and authentication algorithms and techniques used in mobile service and communications equipment, mobile devices, and mobile operating systems and software.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Understanding Cybersecurity of Mobile Networks Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-07-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-20HouseSubcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged.
2021-07-15HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2021-04-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-04-20HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback