US HB2678 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tolls (i.e., pauses) the statute of limitations for federal criminal offenses that are committed by the President or Vice President prior to or during their term of office. (Currently, most federal criminal offenses have a five-year statute of limitations.)
Title
No President is Above the Law Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 589. |
2020-12-31 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-705. |
2020-07-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-07-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1756 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8363 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8363 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents