US HB2657 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disposal of Excess Federal Lands Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to offer for disposal by competitive sale certain federal lands in Arizona, Colorado, Idaho, Montana, Nebraska, Nevada, New Mexico, Oregon, Utah, and Wyoming, previously identified as suitable for disposal in the report submitted to Congress on May 27, 1997, pursuant to the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996. Requires the Secretary to offer such lands for at least fair market value as determined by an independent appraiser. Requires the net proceeds from the sale to be deposited directly into the Treasury for reduction of the public debt. Requires the Secretary to submit to Congress: (1) a list of any identified federal lands that have not been sold and the reasons why they were not sold; and (2) an update of a specified report, including a current inventory of the federal lands under the Secretary's administrative jurisdiction that are suitable for disposal.
Title
Disposal of Excess Federal Lands Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303. |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-412. |
2014-01-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 19. |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-10-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Arizona
Colorado
Idaho
Land transfers
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wyoming
Colorado
Idaho
Land transfers
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
New Mexico
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wyoming