US HB2639 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 103-3)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish forest conservation practices through management, reforestation, and utilization which lead to the sequestration of greenhouse gases, and for other purposes.
Title
Trillion Trees Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2477 (Related) 2021-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2581 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2621 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB2562 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2500 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2581 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2621 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB2562 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HB2500 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2639/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2639/BILLS-117hr2639ih.pdf |