US HB2630 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior, after receiving a request from La Paz County, Arizona, to convey to the county, without consideration, 8,000 acres of specified federal land. The federal land conveyed under this bill: (1) may be used by the county for any public purposes consistent with the Recreation and Public Purposes Act, and (2) shall not be disposed of by the county. The county shall pay or reimburse Interior, as appropriate, for the reasonable transaction and administrative personnel costs associated with such conveyance. The bill declares that the United States is released from any liability arising from any hazardous substance existing on the federal land before such conveyance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2018-07-24SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-07-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6621-6622)
2018-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2630.
2018-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6621-6623)
2018-07-23HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-01-29HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
2018-01-29HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-536.
2017-11-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-11-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-29HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-29HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-10-11HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1222 (Same As) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback