US HB263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-110. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on January 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-110. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Oyster Bay National Wildlife Refuge near Oyster Bay, New York, as the "Congressman Lester Wolff National Wildlife Refuge."
Title
To rename the Oyster Bay National Wildlife Refuge as the Congressman Lester Wolff Oyster Bay National Wildlife Refuge.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-110. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-01-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S147-148) |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9075-9076) |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 263. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9075-9076) |
2019-11-20 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-11 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 45. |
2019-10-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-228. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
House of Representatives
Long Island Sound
Members of Congress
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
House of Representatives
Long Island Sound
Members of Congress
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats