US HB2624 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Trafficking Victims Protection Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) require the appropriate training of all personnel who come into contact with unaccompanied alien children, and (2) hire child welfare professionals. Sets forth related protections for such children regarding: (1) prompt placement with the Office of Refugee Resettlement, (2) qualified resources and child welfare professionals at appropriate ports of entry and stations, (3) confidentiality, (4) notice of rights and access to counsel, and (5) the presence of female officers during the transfer and transport of female detainees. Directs the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to implement a best practices program in the United States and within the country of return to ensure the safe and sustainable repatriation and reintegration of unaccompanied alien children into their country of nationality or of last habitual residence.
Title
Child Trafficking Victims Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Foreign Affairs, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Related) 2014-12-10 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care coverage and access
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care coverage and access
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2624/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2624/BILLS-113hr2624ih.pdf |