US HB2615 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 376.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the National Park Service (NPS) to convey specified federal lands located within the Gulf Islands National Seashore in Jackson County, Mississippi, to the Veterans of Foreign Wars Post 5699 in exchange for certain land located in such county. The values of the parcels to be exchanged shall be determined by an independent appraiser in accordance with nationally recognized appraisal standards. If the values of such parcels are not equal, their values shall be equalized through a cash payment or adjustments to their acreage. The NPS shall require the Post to pay or reimburse the costs incurred by the NPS to carry out such exchange. The bill subjects the exchange to valid existing rights. Land acquired by the United States under this bill shall be administered as part of the Gulf Islands National Seashore.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 376.
2018-04-11SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-228.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-02-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2017-11-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-11-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9442)
2017-11-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615.
2017-11-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9442-9443)
2017-11-28HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-09-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
2017-09-11HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-302.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1260 (Related) 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback