US HB2611 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act (Sec. 2) This bill adjusts the boundary of the Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site in Arkansas to include the 7 residences on South Park Street in Little Rock, which consist of 1.47 acres of specified land. The Department of the Interior may enter into separate cooperative agreements with the owners of such residences to mark, interpret, improve, restore, and provide technical assistance for the preservation and interpretation of their properties. Such an agreement must include a provision specifying that no changes or alterations shall be made to the exterior of the properties except by mutual agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 390 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
2018-01-12SenateSigned by President.
2018-01-02SenatePresented to President.
2017-12-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-12-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
2017-09-13SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2017-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H7251)
2017-09-12HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7287)
2017-09-12HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2611.
2017-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7251-7253)
2017-09-12HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-09-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209.
2017-09-05HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-290.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1202 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback