US HB2607 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 26-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions regarding certain forest management activities conducted by the Department of Agriculture or the Department of the Interior. The bill establishes categorical exclusions from environmental review for activities such as responding to an infestation or protecting a municipal water supply. For certain forest management activities, including those developed through a collaborative process, an environmental review may compare the impact of the proposed activity only to the impact of taking no action.
Title
Resilient Federal Forests Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB691 (Related) 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Legal fees and court costs
Natural disasters
Oregon
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Legal fees and court costs
Natural disasters
Oregon
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public participation and lobbying
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2607/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2607/BILLS-116hr2607ih.pdf |