US HB2606 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Stigler Act Amendments of 2018 This bill amends the Act of August 4, 1947 (commonly known as the Stigler Act) to revise the qualifications that must be met by a person who inherits land originally allotted to members of the Five Civilized Tribes of Oklahoma (the Choctaw, Chickasaw, Creek, Cherokee, and Seminole tribes) for that land to remain in restricted status. When land is in restricted status, it is not subject to taxation and may not be sold or transferred without permission of the Department of the Interior. Under current law, the restricted fee status of land allotted to the Five Tribes is maintained only if the individual holding title has at least 50% Indian blood from one of the Five Tribes. This bill removes this requirement. Thus, the restricted fee status is maintained for all lineal descendants of an original enrollee whose name appears on the membership rolls of the Five Tribes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stigler Act Amendments of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2018-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8134-8135)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2606.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8134-8136)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-08-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 698.
2018-08-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-902.
2018-06-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-06-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-13HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
2017-10-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback