US HB2600 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the conveyance to the State of Iowa of the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County, Iowa, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey to the state of Iowa, without consideration, the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County described in the quit claim deed dated April 13, 1998. As a condition of the conveyance, all costs associated with it are to be paid by the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for the conveyance to the State of Iowa of the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County, Iowa, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-02SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-11-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-11-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8324)
2017-11-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2600.
2017-11-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8324-8325)
2017-11-01HouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-10-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 270.
2017-10-24HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-368.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1987 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback