US HB2600 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the conveyance to the State of Iowa of the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County, Iowa, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey to the state of Iowa, without consideration, the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County described in the quit claim deed dated April 13, 1998. As a condition of the conveyance, all costs associated with it are to be paid by the state.
Title
To provide for the conveyance to the State of Iowa of the reversionary interest held by the United States in certain land in Pottawattamie County, Iowa, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8324) |
2017-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2600. |
2017-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8324-8325) |
2017-11-01 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 270. |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-368. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1987 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
California
Colorado
Government information and archives
Historic sites and heritage areas
Idaho
Illinois
Iowa
Kansas
Land transfers
Missouri
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
North Dakota
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota
Utah
Washington State
Wyoming
Colorado
Government information and archives
Historic sites and heritage areas
Idaho
Illinois
Iowa
Kansas
Land transfers
Missouri
Montana
Nebraska
Nevada
North Dakota
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota
Utah
Washington State
Wyoming