US HB2597 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AIM Act of 2015 Accelerating Innovation in Medicine Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop an accelerating innovation in medicine (AIM) list of medical devices for which, because of their inclusion on the list, insurance benefits and payments are prohibited under Medicare (either directly or on a capitated basis), with the result that no Medicare claim may be submitted and an individual who consents to receive such a device is responsible for paying for it and for any related services. Directs the Secretary to post on a public HHS website or other publicly accessible media an updated list of the medical devices on the AIM list.
Title
AIM Act of 2015 Accelerating Innovation in Medicine Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1757 (Related) 2015-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government information and archives
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2597/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2597/BILLS-114hr2597ih.pdf |