US HB2593 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To create an interdivisional taskforce at the Securities and Exchange Commission for senior investors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Senior Investor Initiative Act of 2023 Senior Security Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2023-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-06-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2721-2722)
2023-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2593.
2023-06-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2721-2723)
2023-06-05HouseMrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2023-06-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 70.
2023-06-05HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-93.
2023-04-26HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
2023-04-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-04-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2023-04-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB955 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback