US HB2584 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Business Activity Tax Simplification Act of 2015 Expands the federal prohibition against state taxation of interstate commerce to: (1) include taxation of out-of-state transactions involving all forms of property, including intangible personal property and services (currently, only sales of tangible personal property are protected); and (2) prohibit state taxation of an out-of-state entity unless such entity has a physical presence in the taxing state. Sets forth criteria for: (1) determining that a person has a physical presence in a state, and (2) the computation of the tax liability of affiliated businesses operating in a state.
Title
Business Activity Tax Simplification Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 7. |
2015-06-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-16 | House | Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged. |
2015-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2584/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2584/BILLS-114hr2584ih.pdf |