US HB2582 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Confirming State Land Grants for Education Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the state of Utah, subject to valid existing rights, to select certain lands under the administrative jurisdiction of the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) of the Department of the Interior that are identified as available for disposal by land exchange in the Record of Decision for the Pony Express Resource Management Plan and Rangeland Program Summary for Utah County in fulfillment of certain land grants made to Utah upon being admitted as a state to further the purposes of the State of Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration, without further land use planning action by the BLM. The criteria listed in Decision 3 of the Lands Program of the resource management plan shall not apply to any lands selected by Utah pursuant to this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirming State Land Grants for Education Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-07SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2017-10-03SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-10-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7644)
2017-10-02HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2582.
2017-10-02HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7643-7644)
2017-10-02HouseMr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
2017-09-12HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-305.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1665 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback