US HB257 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognition of Jerusalem as the Capital of the State of Israel Act This bill states that it is U.S. policy to recognize Jerusalem as the undivided capital of Israel. The bill expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should recognize the sovereign status of an undivided Jerusalem as Israel's capital, (2) recognizing Jerusalem as Israel's capital and transferring the U.S. Embassy to Jerusalem from Tel Aviv will signal U.S. commitment to Israel, (3) the President and the Department of State should affirm as a matter of U.S. policy that Jerusalem must remain Israel's undivided capital, (4) the President should implement the provisions of the Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 and begin the process of relocating the U.S. Embassy in Israel to Jerusalem, and (5) U.S. officials should refrain from actions that contradict U.S. law on this subject. The bill states that any official U.S. government document that lists countries and their capital cities should identify Jerusalem as Israel's capital. The President shall relocate the U.S. Embassy in Israel to Jerusalem by January 1, 2019. The Jerusalem Embassy Act of 1995 is amended to eliminate the President's authority, effective January, 1, 2018, to waive certain funding limitations for State Department acquisition and maintenance of buildings abroad until the U.S. Embassy in Jerusalem has officially opened.
Title
Recognition of Jerusalem as the Capital of the State of Israel Act
Sponsors
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Related) 2017-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB4718 (Same As) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB4718 (Same As) 2017-12-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Arab-Israeli relations
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Arab-Israeli relations
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/257/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr257/BILLS-115hr257ih.pdf |