US HB2560 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Commerce to establish the Sea Turtle Rescue Assistance Grant Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Sea Turtle Rescue Assistance and Rehabilitation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 111 (Y: 332 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 332 - 82 (Roll no. 111). |
2024-04-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-04-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-04-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2560. |
2024-04-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-04-11 | House | Mr. Tiffany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-04-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-433. |
2023-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-10-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2086 (Related) 2023-06-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.