US HB2558 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 123-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently allow a tax deduction at the time an investment in qualified property is made, and for other purposes.
Title
Accelerate Long-term Investment Growth Now Act ALIGN Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB197 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1166 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5649 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1166 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5649 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2558/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2558/BILLS-117hr2558ih.pdf |