US HB2548 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hazard Eligibility and Local Projects Act This bill expands eligibility under a hazard mitigation assistance program to receive such assistance for acquisition or relocation projects already in progress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazard Eligibility and Local Projects Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 688 (Y: 409 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-12-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 7 (Roll no. 688). (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10276)
2019-12-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10600)
2019-12-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2548.
2019-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10276-10277)
2019-12-16HouseMrs. Fletcher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-12-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 270.
2019-12-12HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
2019-12-12HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-339, Part I.
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-26HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3285 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback