US HB2546 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-22)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Blue Star/Gold Star Flag Act of 2010 - States that a condominium association, cooperative association, or residential real estate management association may not adopt or enforce any policy, or enter into any agreement, that would restrict or prevent an association member from displaying a Service Flag on residential property within the association with respect to which such member has a separate ownership interest or a right to exclusive possession or use. (A Service Flag, also known as a "blue star banner," is an official banner authorized by the Department of Defense [DOD] for display by families who have members serving in the Armed Forces during any period of war or hostilities the United States may be engaged in for the duration of such hostilities.) States that nothing in this Act shall be considered to permit any display or use inconsistent with: (1) any DOD regulations regarding rules or customs pertaining to the proper display or use of the Service Flag; or (2) any reasonable restriction pertaining to the time, place, or manner of displaying the flag necessary to protect a substantial interest of the condominium, cooperative, or residential real estate management association.
Title
Blue Star/Gold Star Flag Act of 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. | |
2010-05-19 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-19 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3603) | |
2010-05-19 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2546. | |
2010-05-19 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3602-3604) | |
2010-05-19 | Mr. Moore (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3477 (Related) 2010-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Cooperative and condominium housing
Housing and community development
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Real estate business
Housing and community development
Military personnel and dependents
National symbols
Real estate business