US HB2526 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
POST GRAD Act Protecting Our Students by Terminating Graduate Rates that Add to Debt Act This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to make graduate and professional students eligible to receive subsidized Stafford Loans under the Federal Direct Loan Program beginning on July 1, 2017. (Graduate and professional students have been ineligible to receive subsidized Stafford Loans since July 1, 2012.)
Title
POST GRAD Act Protecting Our Students by Terminating Graduate Rates that Add to Debt Act
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5549 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Education
Education
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Department of Education
Education
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2526/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2526/BILLS-115hr2526ih.pdf |