US HB2523 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 to improve the COVID–19 Veteran Rapid Retraining Assistance program, to make certain technical corrections to the Johnny Isakson and David P. Roe, M.D. Veterans Health Care and Benefits Improvement Act of 2020, and for other purposes.
Title
Training in High-demand Roles to Improve Veteran Employment Act THRIVE Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-16. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-06-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3929-3930) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1990-1992) |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 2523 are considered vacated. |
2021-04-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2523. |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1965-1968; text: CR H1965-1967) |
2021-04-20 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2492 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2492 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.