US HB2522 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act to establish the Cerro de la Olla Wilderness in the Río Grande del Norte National Monument and to modify the boundary of the Río Grande del Norte National Monument.
Title
Cerro de la Olla Wilderness Establishment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB177 (Same As) 2022-09-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 494.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2522/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2522/BILLS-117hr2522ih.pdf |