US HB2512 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Trails System Act to designate the Chisholm National Historic Trail and the Western National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Title
Chisholm National Historic Trail and Western National Historic Trail Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 410. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-569. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-11-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1112 (Same As) 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.