US HB2510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To regulate large capacity ammunition feeding devices.
Title
Keep Americans Safe Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Related) 2022-08-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB736 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1108 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7910 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate.
HR1153 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB9207 (Related) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB736 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1108 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7910 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate.
HR1153 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB9207 (Related) 2022-10-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2510/BILLS-117hr2510ih.pdf |