US HB2483 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 49, United States Code, to include affordable housing incentives in certain capital investment grants, and for other purposes.
Title
Build More Housing Near Transit Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3237 (Related) 2021-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3237 (Related) 2021-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2483/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2483/BILLS-117hr2483ih.pdf |