US HB2476 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-18)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Became Public Law No: 116-108. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Securing American Nonprofit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2019 This bill establishes in the Department of Homeland Security a Nonprofit Security Grant Program, under which the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall make grants to eligible nonprofit organizations (tax-exempt organizations and those determined to be at risk of a terrorist attack) for target hardening and other security enhancements to protect against terrorist attacks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Securing American Nonprofit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-108. (TXT | PDF)
2020-01-24SenateSigned by President.
2020-01-14SenatePresented to President.
2019-12-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-19SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7226)
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4365)
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2476.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4365-4367)
2019-06-10HouseMiss Rice (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 67.
2019-05-30HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-92.
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-05-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1539 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 193.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback