US HB2466 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2026 and expands the scope of the State Opioid Response Grant program that is administered by the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration. Current law limits the use of these grants to specifically address the opioid crisis and opioid use disorders, while this bill allows the grants to address substance use disorders more broadly.
Title
State Opioid Response Grant Authorization Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5809-5810) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2466. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5809-5811) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466. |
2020-11-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-568. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Prescription drugs
State and local government operations