US HB2464 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Demanding Accountability for Veterans Act of 2015 Requires the Inspector General (IG) of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), at the same time the IG submits a report to the VA, to submit a copy of such report to the House and Senate Committees on Veterans' Affairs, including: (1) an explanation of any changes to the report recommended by the VA Secretary, and (2) a list of each manager responsible for an issue in a report that recommends actions to address to a public health or safety issue in the VA. Requires the VA: (1) within seven days after such submission, to notify each such manager of such issue; (2) to direct such manager to resolve the issue, (3) to provide the manager with appropriate counseling and a mitigation plan for resolving the issue; and (4) to ensure that the manager's performance review includes an evaluation of actions taken regarding such issue. Prohibits the Secretary from paying a bonus or award to any such manager if such issue remains unresolved.
Title
Demanding Accountability for Veterans Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2464/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2464/BILLS-114hr2464ih.pdf |