US HB2454 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) develop a data framework to integrate existing DHS datasets and systems for access by authorized personnel in a manner consistent with relevant legal authorities and privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties policies and protections; (2) ensure that all information of a DHS office or component that falls within the scope of the information sharing environment, and any information or intelligence relevant to priority mission needs and capability requirements of the homeland security enterprise, is included; and (3) ensure that the framework is accessible to DHS employees who have an appropriate security clearance, who are assigned to perform a function that requires access, and who are trained in applicable standards for safeguarding and using such information. DHS shall: (1) issue guidance for DHS employees authorized to access and contribute to the framework that enforces a duty to share between DHS offices and components for mission needs; and (2) promulgate data standards and instruct DHS components to make available information through the framework in a machine-readable format. DHS may exclude information that could: jeopardize the protection of sources, methods, or activities; compromise a criminal or national security investigation; be inconsistent with the other federal laws or regulations; or be duplicative or not serve an operational purpose. DHS shall incorporate into such framework systems capabilities for auditing and ensuring the security of information. Such capabilities shall include: (1) mechanisms for identifying insider threats and security risks; and (2) safeguards for privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties. DHS shall ensure that, by two years after this bill's enactment, the framework has the ability to include appropriate information in existence within the department to meet its critical mission operations.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-331. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H10152; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10129) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Hurd objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2454. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Mr. Hurd moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10129-10130) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.4071 Amendment SA 4071 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.4071 Amendment SA 4071 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S7371; text: CR S7371) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7371) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7243) |
2017-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2454. |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7243-7245) |
2017-09-12 | House | Mr. Hurd moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2397 (Related) 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 665.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Arms control and nonproliferation
Chemical and biological weapons
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Nuclear weapons
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Arms control and nonproliferation
Chemical and biological weapons
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Nuclear weapons
Right of privacy
Terrorism