US HB2451 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-12-04 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 575 Dexter Street in Central Falls, Rhode Island, as the "Elizabeth Buffum Chace Post Office".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-04SenatePresented to President.
2019-11-25SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-11-21SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767)
2019-10-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247.
2019-10-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8171)
2019-10-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2451.
2019-10-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8171-8172)
2019-10-16HouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1272 (Related) 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback