US HB2445 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows creditors to use certain alternative standards when evaluating an applicant's ability to pay for purposes of obtaining a home mortgage.
Title
Self-Employed Mortgage Access Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB540 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Housing finance and home ownership
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2445/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2445/BILLS-116hr2445ih.pdf |